PA HB1552 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-7)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-26 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on June 13 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-26 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act establishing the Pennsylvania Infection Control Advisory Committee; providing for duties of the committee, the Department of Health, the Pennsylvania Health Care Cost Containment Council and the Patient Safety Authority; requiring health care facilities to develop and implement infection control plans; and imposing penalties.
Title
An Act establishing the Pennsylvania Infection Control Advisory Committee; providing for duties of the committee, the Department of Health, the Pennsylvania Health Care Cost Containment Council and the Patient Safety Authority; requiring health care facilities to develop and implement infection control plans; and imposing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-06-26 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-26 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-06-20 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-18 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-06-18 | First consideration | |
2007-06-18 | Reported as amended | |
2007-06-13 | Referred to INSURANCE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1552 |