PA HB1610 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-11 - Laid on the table
Status: Introduced on June 21 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-11 - Laid on the table
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 9, 1990 (P.L.340, No.78), known as the Public Safety Emergency Telephone Act, further defining "contribution rate"; and further providing for county plan and expenditures.
Title
An Act amending the act of July 9, 1990 (P.L.340, No.78), known as the Public Safety Emergency Telephone Act, further defining "contribution rate"; and further providing for county plan and expenditures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-12-11 | Laid on the table | |
2007-11-21 | Removed from table | |
2007-11-21 | Laid on the table | |
2007-10-17 | Removed from table | |
2007-10-17 | Laid on the table | |
2007-07-15 | Removed from table | |
2007-07-15 | Laid on the table | |
2007-06-30 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-27 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-06-27 | First consideration | |
2007-06-27 | Reported as amended | |
2007-06-21 | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1610 |