PA HB1769 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Engrossed on October 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-11-15 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-11-15 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 11, 1998 (P.L.58, No.15), known as the Combustible and Flammable Liquids Act, further providing for regulations and for prohibitions.
Title
Further providing for regulations and for prohibitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-10-04 - House - HB 1769 PN 4395, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-28 - House - HB 1769 PN 2460, 2009 A4724, FAIRCHILD (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-28 - House - HB 1769 PN 2460, 2009 A4724, FAIRCHILD (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-15 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS | |
2010-10-04 | In the Senate | |
2010-10-04 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-09-28 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2010-09-27 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-09-11 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-09-11 | Removed from table | |
2009-09-10 | Laid on the table | |
2009-09-10 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-07-15 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-07-15 | First consideration | |
2009-07-15 | Reported as amended | |
2009-06-24 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |