PA HB1868 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-24 - Act No. 161
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-24 - Act No. 161
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 3, 1933 (P.L.242, No.86), referred to as the Cosmetology Law, further providing for eligibility for examination and for limited licenses.
Title
Further providing for eligibility for examination and for limited licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Creighton [R] | Rep. Michael Fleck [R] | Rep. Jaret Gibbons [D] | Rep. Keith Gillespie [R] |
Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Dominic Costa [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-10-16 - House - HB 1868 PN 4074, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - Senate - HB 1868 PN 4074, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-02 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-25 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - HB 1868 PN 3510, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - Senate - HB 1868 PN 4074, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-02 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-25 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - House - HB 1868 PN 3510, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-24 | House | Act No. 161 |
2012-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2012-10-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2012-10-16 | House | Signed in Senate |
2012-10-16 | House | Signed in House |
2012-10-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (194-1) |
2012-10-16 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-10-15 | House | Referred to RULES |
2012-10-15 | House | In the House |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2012-10-02 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2012-10-01 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-10-01 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-09-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-06-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2012-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-06-20 | House | Second consideration |
2012-06-19 | House | Removed from table |
2012-05-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-05-09 | House | First consideration |
2012-05-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-09-26 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |