PA HB2191 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 7 (Banks and Banking) and 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Title 7, providing for short-term loan protection; and, in Title 18, further providing for deceptive or fraudulent business practices and providing for unlicensed short-term lending.
Title
In Title 7, providing for short-term loan protection; and, in Title 18, further providing for deceptive or fraudulent business practices and providing for unlicensed short-term lending.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-06 - House - HB 2191 PN 3645, FP (Y: 102 N: 90 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10409, COHEN (Y: 87 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10411, COHEN (Y: 88 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10385, STURLA (Y: 46 N: 148 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10386, STURLA (Y: 89 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10398, STURLA (Y: 90 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10407, STURLA (Y: 80 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10539, STURLA (Y: 191 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10539, SUSP RULES, STURLA (Y: 173 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10408, STURLA (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10404, STURLA (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10384, PRESTON (Y: 88 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10417, THOMAS (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10382, PRESTON (Y: 190 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10365, THOMAS (Y: 191 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10409, COHEN (Y: 87 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10411, COHEN (Y: 88 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10385, STURLA (Y: 46 N: 148 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10386, STURLA (Y: 89 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10398, STURLA (Y: 90 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10407, STURLA (Y: 80 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10539, STURLA (Y: 191 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10539, SUSP RULES, STURLA (Y: 173 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10408, STURLA (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10404, STURLA (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10384, PRESTON (Y: 88 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10417, THOMAS (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10382, PRESTON (Y: 190 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - House - HB 2191 PN 3511, 2011 A10365, THOMAS (Y: 191 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2012-06-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-06-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (102-90) |
2012-06-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-04 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 3645 |
2012-06-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-06-04 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2012-05-10 | House | Removed from table |
2012-05-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-05-09 | House | First consideration |
2012-05-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2012-03-14 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |