PA HB35 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-04-23 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-04-23 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for sexual abuse of children.
Title
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for sexual abuse of children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-04-23 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2007-04-17 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-03-21 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-03-20 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-03-19 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-03-19 | Removed from table | |
2007-03-19 | Laid on the table | |
2007-03-19 | First consideration | |
2007-03-19 | Reported as amended | |
2007-01-30 | Referred to JUDICIARY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=35 |