PA HB732 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Act No. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Act No. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in realty transfer tax, further providing for excluded transactions; and providing for local resource manufacturing tax credit and for a penalty.
Title
In realty transfer tax, further providing for excluded transactions; and providing for local resource manufacturing tax credit and for a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-14 - House - House Floor: HB 732 PN 4118, CONCUR (Y: 163 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Floor: HB 732 PN 4118, 2019 A6695, SUSP RULES, O'MARA (Y: 89 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 732 PN 4118, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 732 PN 960, A6649, SANTARSIERO AMENDMENT NO. A-6649 (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 732 PN 960, A6669, YUDICHAK AMENDMENT NO. A-6669 RECONSIDER (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 732 PN 960, A6669, YUDICHAK AMENDMENT NO. A-6669 (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 732 PN 960, A6683, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-6683 TO AMENDMENT NO. A-6669 (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 732 PN 960, A6687, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-6687 TO AMENDMENT NO. A-6669 (Y: 19 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 732 PN 960, A6677, SANTARSIERO AMENDMENT NO. A-6677 TO AMENDMENT NO. A-6669 (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Floor: HB 732 PN 960, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Floor: HB 732 PN 4118, 2019 A6695, SUSP RULES, O'MARA (Y: 89 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 732 PN 4118, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 732 PN 960, A6649, SANTARSIERO AMENDMENT NO. A-6649 (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 732 PN 960, A6669, YUDICHAK AMENDMENT NO. A-6669 RECONSIDER (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 732 PN 960, A6669, YUDICHAK AMENDMENT NO. A-6669 (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 732 PN 960, A6683, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-6683 TO AMENDMENT NO. A-6669 (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 732 PN 960, A6687, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-6687 TO AMENDMENT NO. A-6669 (Y: 19 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 732 PN 960, A6677, SANTARSIERO AMENDMENT NO. A-6677 TO AMENDMENT NO. A-6669 (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Floor: HB 732 PN 960, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | House | Act No. 66 |
2020-07-23 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-07-15 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-07-15 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-07-14 | House | Signed in House |
2020-07-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (163-38) |
2020-07-14 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-07-14 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-07-13 | House | In the House |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (40-9) |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (40-9) |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-10-25 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2019-10-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-10-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2019-10-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-15 | House | Second consideration |
2019-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-08 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to FINANCE |