PA HB907 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for sentencing procedure for murder of the first degree.
Title
Further providing for sentencing procedure for murder of the first degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-14 - House - HB 907 PN 3886, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 185 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-09 - House - HB 907 PN 1026, 2009 A7481, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 189 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-09 - House - HB 907 PN 1026, 2009 A7481, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 189 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2010-06-14 | In the Senate | |
2010-06-14 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-06-09 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2010-06-09 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-05-26 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-05-26 | Removed from table | |
2010-05-25 | Laid on the table | |
2010-05-25 | First consideration | |
2010-05-25 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-12 | Referred to JUDICIARY |