PA HR399 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-09 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-09 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution memorializing the Congress of the United States to work with General Motors Corporation to ensure that the General Motors brand dealership owners are treated justly and compensated fairly.
Title
Memorializing the Congress of the United States to work with General Motors Corporation to ensure that the General Motors brand dealership owners are treated justly and compensated fairly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-11-09 - House - HR 399 PN 2391 (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-09 | Adopted | |
2009-09-18 | Removed from table | |
2009-09-18 | Laid on the table | |
2009-08-20 | Removed from table | |
2009-08-20 | Laid on the table | |
2009-08-17 | Removed from table | |
2009-08-17 | Laid on the table | |
2009-08-03 | Removed from table | |
2009-08-03 | Laid on the table | |
2009-07-17 | Reported as committed | |
2009-07-06 | Referred to COMMERCE |