PA SB144 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Commonwealth services, providing for firefighting foam management.
Title
In Commonwealth services, providing for firefighting foam management.
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. Maria Collett [D] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Carolyn Comitta [D] |
Sen. Frank Farry [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 144 PN 390, Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 144 PN 119, 2023 A160, YAW Amendment No. A-160 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 144 PN 119, 2023 A160, YAW Amendment No. A-160 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2023-03-07 | House | In the House |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (36-14) |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (50-0) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-02-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |