PA SB297 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-23 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-23 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 30, 1996 (P.L.732, No.131), known as the Pennsylvania Innkeepers' Rights Act, providing for prospective employee background checks.
Title
Providing for prospective employee background checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-05-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |