PA SB607 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-14 - Act No. 62 of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-14 - Act No. 62 of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 26, 1971 (P.L.351, No.91), known as the State Lottery Law, in pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for determination of eligibility.
Title
In pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for determination of eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - House - House Floor: SB 607 PN 657, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-27 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 607 PN 657, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - House - House Floor: SB 607 PN 657, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-27 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 607 PN 657, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-14 | House | Act No. 62 of 2023 |
2023-12-14 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2023-12-12 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2023-12-12 | House | Signed in House |
2023-12-11 | House | Signed in Senate |
2023-12-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (203-0) |
2023-12-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-11-15 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-11-15 | House | Second consideration |
2023-11-14 | House | Removed from table |
2023-09-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-09-27 | House | First consideration |
2023-09-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-06-20 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |
2023-06-19 | House | In the House |
2023-06-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2023-06-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-05-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |