PA SB663 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Act No. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Act No. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in support matters generally, further providing for liability for support; and, in child custody, further providing for consideration of criminal conviction.
Title
In support matters generally, further providing for liability for support; and, in child custody, further providing for consideration of criminal conviction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-17 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-17 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 663 PN 1156, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - House Floor: SB 663 PN 1156, FP (Y: 181 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Floor: SB 663 PN 1136, 2015 A3036, PETRARCA (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Floor: SB 663 PN 1136, 2015 A3036, SUSP RULES, PETRARCA (Y: 187 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02699 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02699 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 663 PN 1092, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-17 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 663 PN 1156, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - House Floor: SB 663 PN 1156, FP (Y: 181 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Floor: SB 663 PN 1136, 2015 A3036, PETRARCA (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Floor: SB 663 PN 1136, 2015 A3036, SUSP RULES, PETRARCA (Y: 187 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02699 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02699 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 663 PN 1092, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-01 | Senate | Act No. 40 |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2015-09-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2015-09-21 | Senate | Signed in House |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (47-0) |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2015-07-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-07-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (181-0) |
2015-07-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-30 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-30 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-06-29 | House | Removed from table |
2015-06-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-28 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-28 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2015-06-24 | House | In the House |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-05-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |