PA SB968 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for the offense of cruelty to animals.
Title
Further providing for the offense of cruelty to animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-06 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Removed from table |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2012-01-25 | Senate | Removed from table |
2012-01-25 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2012-01-18 | Senate | Amended on second consideration |
2011-12-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-12-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |