RI H7453 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL PROCEDURE -- ELECTRONIC INFORMATION AND DATA PRIVACY ACT - Requires search warrant for electronic information, prohibits stingray cell-site simulators.
Title
Requires search warrant for electronic information, prohibits stingray cell-site simulators.
Sponsors
Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Jon Brien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2024) |
2024-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7453.pdf |