RI H7570 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL OFFENSES -- WEAPONS - Allows law enforcement to utilize mufflers, silencers, or other devices for deadening or muffling the sound of a firearm while acting within the scope of their official duties under the supervision of the police chief or colonel of the state police.
Title
Allows law enforcement to utilize mufflers, silencers, or other devices for deadening or muffling the sound of a firearm while acting within the scope of their official duties under the supervision of the police chief or colonel of the state police.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2024) |
2024-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7570.pdf |