RI S0027 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-10 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-10 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires coverage for residential/inpatient mental health services for detox/stabilization/substance abuse disorders without preauthorization or be subject to concurrent review during the first 28 days.
Title
Comprehensive Discharge Planning
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/09/2023) |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2023) |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/20/2023) |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |