RI S0407 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry (would Expand The Meaning Of Unnecessary Cruelty To One Who Willfully, Intentionally, Maliciously, Recklessly And/or Knowingly Authorizes Or Permits That Animal To Be Subjected To Unnecessary Torture, Suffering Or Cruelty Of Any Kind)
Title
An Act Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry (would Expand The Meaning Of Unnecessary Cruelty To One Who Willfully, Intentionally, Maliciously, Recklessly And/or Knowingly Authorizes Or Permits That Animal To Be Subjected To Unnecessary Torture, Suffering Or Cruelty Of Any Kind)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2013-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2013) |
2013-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2013-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2013) |
2013-06-13 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2013) |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2013) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |