RI S0863 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the commissioner of education to develop statewide academic standards and curriculum frameworks for the core subjects of mathematics, English language arts, science and technology, history and social studies, world languages, and the arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Curriculum

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Senate - Curriculum approval of amendment (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/26/2019)
2019-06-24HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub B
2019-06-21HouseProposed Substitute
2019-06-21HouseScheduled for consideration (06/24/2019)
2019-06-14HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2019-06-13SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2019-06-11SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019)
2019-06-05SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-04SenateProposed Substitute
2019-05-28SenateScheduled for consideration (06/05/2019)
2019-05-28SenateMeeting postponed (05/29/2019)
2019-05-24SenateScheduled for consideration
2019-05-15SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-10SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2019)
2019-05-08SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback