RI S2004 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (allow Jacqueline C. Damato To Join Theresa R. Fraatz And Michael A. Disano In Marriage Within The City Of Pawtucket, Rhode Island, On Or About June 26, 2010.)
Title
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages (allow Jacqueline C. Damato To Join Theresa R. Fraatz And Michael A. Disano In Marriage Within The City Of Pawtucket, Rhode Island, On Or About June 26, 2010.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-03-03 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-03-03 | House passed in concurrence | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-02-25 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2010-02-25 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2010-02-11 | Senate read and passed | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2010-02-04 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-02-04 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-01-07 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2004.pdf |