RI S2742 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A provider of a club, facility, or services to a consumer must stop automatic deductions from the consumer’s account or credit card within thirty (30) calendar days of receiving a notice to stop from the consumer.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions -- Unfair Sales Practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |