RI S2802 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- EXAMINATIONS - Amends the statutory provisions regarding domestic and foreign insurers and insurer examinations to provide provisions with regard to cybersecurity events involving Rhode Island consumers.
Title
Amends the statutory provisions regarding domestic and foreign insurers and insurer examinations to provide provisions with regard to cybersecurity events involving Rhode Island consumers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |