SC H3109 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Dillard
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Dillard
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 12-36-2120, Relating To Sales Tax Exemptions, So As To Provide A Sales Tax Exemption For Feminine Hygiene Products, Diapers, And Toilet Paper.
Title
Sales Tax Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Dillard |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-12-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-12-08 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0149 (Similar To) 2023-07-27 - Scrivener's error corrected
H3110 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
H3563 (Similar To) 2024-04-24 - Committee report: Favorable Finance
H3110 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
H3563 (Similar To) 2024-04-24 - Committee report: Favorable Finance
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3109&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3109_20221208.htm |