SC H3145 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-16)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That An Association Formed By A Group Of Electric Cooperatives That Meets The Requirements Of Section 501(c)(6) Of The Internal Revenue Code, Is Organized Under The Laws Of This State And Has As Its Purpose The Representation Of The Interests Of Electric Cooperatives In This State, Is Subject To Certain Requirements, To Require Certain Disclosures By The Association, To Authorize The Association To Compensate Its Board Of Trustees And Provide For Specific Requirements In Regard To This Compensation, And To Provide For Specified Ethical And Other Rules Of Conduct, Including Prohibited Actions By Trustees And Officers Of The Association

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric coops, audits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 56
2019-05-31 Effective date See Act for Effective Date
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 76
2019-05-09SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2019-05-09HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-09HouseSenate amendment amended
2019-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2019-05-08SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-08SenateAmended
2019-05-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-07SenateRead second time
2019-05-07SenateAmended
2019-05-07SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-04-25 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-24SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2019-04-05SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Gambrell (ch), Hutto, Massey, Sabb, Climer
2019-03-26SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-26SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-26HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-03-21 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-20HouseRoll call Yeas-104 Nays-6
2019-03-20HouseRead second time
2019-03-20HouseAmended
2019-03-07HouseDebate adjourned
2019-03-07HouseAmended
2019-03-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry, Bannister, Calhoon, Huggins, Gilliard, Taylor
2019-03-06HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2019-03-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell, Wheeler
2019-03-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: D.C.Moss, G.R.Smith, Elliott, Sandifer, Lucas, Ballentine, Caskey, Simrill, West, Murphy, McKnight, Mace, Kimmons, Davis, Magnuson, Sottile, Hewitt, Hiott, B.Newton, Pope, Forrest, Bales, Rutherford, R.Williams, Gilliam, Norrell, Funderburk, G.M.Smith, Weeks, Ridgeway, Yow, W.Newton, Bamberg, Stavrinakis, McCoy, Erickson
2019-03-04 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-02-28HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-02-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell
2019-02-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, Kirby, Willis
2019-02-20HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Collins
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0539 (Similar To) 2019-02-20 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0760 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3349150(n/a)See Bill Text
3349160(n/a)See Bill Text
3349255(n/a)See Bill Text
3349420(n/a)See Bill Text
3349430(n/a)See Bill Text
3349440(n/a)See Bill Text
334950(n/a)See Bill Text
3349610(n/a)See Bill Text
3349615(n/a)See Bill Text
3349620(n/a)See Bill Text
3349621(n/a)See Bill Text
3349625(n/a)See Bill Text
3349630(n/a)See Bill Text
3349640(n/a)See Bill Text
3349645(n/a)See Bill Text
5827840(n/a)See Bill Text
58450(n/a)See Bill Text
58455(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3145&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3145_20181218.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3145_20190228.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3145_20190304.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3145_20190307.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3145_20190320.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3145_20190321.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3145_20190424.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3145_20190425.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3145_20190507.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3145_20190508.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3145_20190508A.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3145_20190509.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16142
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16768

Bill Comments

feedback