SC H3767 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commend The Outstanding Students And Leaders Of The United States Army Junior Reserve Officers' Training Corps In South Carolina Schools, And Declare April 27, 2023, As Jrotc Day At The South Carolina State House.
Title
JROTC Day at the State House
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Education |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-01-24 | House | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3767&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3767_20230124.htm |