SC H4828 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That Youth Hunters Fifteen Years Of Age And Under Must Be Accompanied By A Licensed Adult On A Youth Hunting Day And To Provide That The License And Tag Requirement Is Waived For A Youth Hunter On A Youth Hunting Day.
Title
Youth hunting days
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Table Amendment (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Table Amendment (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-02-16 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-02-15 | House | Roll call Yeas-67 Nays-30 |
2018-02-15 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2018-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Amended |
2018-02-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Williams |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-01 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0913 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Act No. 200