SD HB1077 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions regarding designation of a no maintenance highway.
Title
Revise provisions regarding designation of a no maintenance highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 527 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 443 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 0. S.J. 389 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 362 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 280 |
2019-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 300 |
2019-01-31 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. H.J. 278 |
2019-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 171 |