SD HB1085 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit certain political advertising in highway rights-of-way.
Title
Prohibit certain political advertising in highway rights-of-way.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor H.J. 740 | |
2011-03-08 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 688 | |
2011-03-07 | Signed by President S.J. 640 | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 621 | |
2011-03-02 | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 10. H.J. 597 | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 556 | |
2011-02-25 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 542 | |
2011-02-23 | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 495 | |
2011-02-23 | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1085fb | |
2011-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-08 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 357 | |
2011-02-07 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 16. H.J. 302 | |
2011-02-02 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 259 | |
2011-02-02 | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1085fa | |
2011-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-01-31 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-24 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 140 |