SD HB1087 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Promote free speech and intellectual diversity at certain institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promote free speech and intellectual diversity at certain institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Reconsidered (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
2019-03-13SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 13, 2019 H.J. 755
2019-03-12SenateSigned by the President S.J. 716
2019-03-12SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 747
2019-03-12SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 12. H.J. 722
2019-03-11SenateHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 715
2019-03-07SenateSenate Title amended, Passed S.J. 663 Amendment 1087btb
2019-03-07SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 7. S.J. 663
2019-03-06SenateState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 625
2019-03-06SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1087bk
2019-03-06SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-03-04SenateState Affairs Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2.
2019-02-27SenateState Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 534
2019-02-27SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1087bd
2019-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-20SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 429
2019-02-19HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 24. H.J. 434
2019-02-14HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 423
2019-02-14HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 419 Amendment 1087bc
2019-02-13HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 394
2019-02-12HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 373
2019-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 356
2019-02-06HouseEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 6. H.J. 321
2019-02-06HouseEducation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1087ba
2019-02-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 189

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1087&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1087P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1087HED.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1087H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1087SST.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1087S.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1087ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27885&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28406&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28946&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29064&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29247&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29331&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29417&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback