SD HB1099 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 36. H.J. 297
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 36. H.J. 297
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permit taxing districts to revise the base amount of revenue payable from property taxes.
Title
Permit taxing districts to revise the base amount of revenue payable from property taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ahlers [D] | Rep. Julie Bartling [D] | Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] |
Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Sen. Joni Cutler [R] | Rep. Thomas Deadrick [R] | Rep. Paul Dennert [D] |
Rep. Noel Hamiel [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Haverly [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Rep. Kent Juhnke [R] |
Rep. Don Kopp [R] | Rep. Kristi Noem [R] | Sen. David Novstrup [R] | Rep. Ryan Olson [R] |
Rep. Carol Pitts [R] | Sen. Timothy Rave [R] | Rep. Larry Tidemann [R] | Sen. Mike Vehle [R] |
Rep. Mike Verchio [R] | Sen. Susan Wismer [D] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 36. H.J. 297 | |
2010-02-03 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 297 Amendment 1099fc | |
2010-02-02 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 277 | |
2010-01-28 | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 5. H.J. 210 | |
2010-01-28 | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1099fa | |
2010-01-28 | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1099fb | |
2010-01-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-21 | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 146 |