SD HB1243 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to the Board of Regents for a cost-of-living increase and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to the Board of Regents for a cost-of-living increase and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - Referred to (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - Referred to (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. |
2022-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to House Education H.J. 156 |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading House H.J. 139 |