SD HB1248 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 741
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 741
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extend the sunset of the one-half percent increase in the gross receipts tax imposed on visitor-related businesses.
Title
Extend the sunset of the one-half percent increase in the gross receipts tax imposed on visitor-related businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor H.J. 741 | |
2011-03-11 | Signed by President S.J. 699 | |
2011-03-11 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 738 | |
2011-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 727 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 675 | |
2011-03-09 | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 704 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 671 Amendment Cc1248A | |
2011-03-09 | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 695 Amendment Cc1248A | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 623 | |
2011-03-03 | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 617 | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 577 Amendment 1248xta | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 7. S.J. 576 | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 576 Amendment 1248ob | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 553 | |
2011-02-25 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 533 | |
2011-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-22 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 483 | |
2011-02-17 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 451 | |
2011-02-16 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 433 | |
2011-02-14 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 368 | |
2011-02-14 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1248fa | |
2011-02-14 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 226 |