SD SB126 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 714
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 714
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain publications date citations for references to the International Building Code and International Property Maintenance Code.
Title
Revise certain publications date citations for references to the International Building Code and International Property Maintenance Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 714 |
2015-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 646 |
2015-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 670 |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by President S.J. 628 |
2015-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 616 |
2015-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 600 |
2015-03-03 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 563 |
2015-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-11 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 384 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 356 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 329 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 211 |