SD SB141 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2017 S.J. 746
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2017 S.J. 746
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to child support.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to child support.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] | Sen. Troy Heinert [D] |
Sen. Kris Langer [R] | Sen. Jeff Partridge [R] | Sen. Deb Soholt [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] |
Sen. Jim White [R] | Sen. Timothy Johns [R] | Rep. Julie Bartling [D] | Sen. Mary Duvall [R] |
Rep. Bob Glanzer [R] | Rep. Spencer Hawley [D] | Rep. Tom Holmes [R] | Rep. David Lust [R] |
Rep. Kent Peterson [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Rep. Ray Ring [D] | Rep. Tim Rounds [R] |
Rep. Tona Rozum [R] | Sen. Kyle Schoenfish [R] | Rep. Karen Soli [D] | Rep. Mike Stevens [R] |
Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] | Rep. Charles Turbiville [R] | Sen. Susan Wismer [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 40 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to another day (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 40 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to another day (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2017 S.J. 746 |
2017-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 727 |
2017-03-09 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 710 |
2017-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 739 |
2017-03-08 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 6. S.J. 678 |
2017-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 40, NAYS 26. H.J. 671 |
2017-03-01 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 587 |
2017-03-01 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 141fb |
2017-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 535 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 529 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 431 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. Amendment 141wa |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Judiciary Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 141fa |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 231 |