SD SB178 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to the rights and duties of joint legal custodians.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to the rights and duties of joint legal custodians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 59 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 706 | |
2011-03-11 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 692 | |
2011-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 727 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by President S.J. 677 | |
2011-03-08 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 8. H.J. 680 | |
2011-03-07 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 637 | |
2011-03-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-03-02 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-03-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-24 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 514 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 509 | |
2011-02-22 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. | |
2011-02-22 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 478 Amendment 178ra | |
2011-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-17 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 243 |