SD SB77 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require school boards to approve pick-up locations for any open enrolled students who are transported in their resident school districts by receiving school districts.
Title
Require school boards to approve pick-up locations for any open enrolled students who are transported in their resident school districts by receiving school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 706 | |
2011-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 682 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 706 | |
2011-03-08 | Signed by President S.J. 663 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 7. S.J. 623 | |
2011-03-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 16. H.J. 609 | |
2011-02-28 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 542 | |
2011-02-28 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 77cj | |
2011-02-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-23 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 493 | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 12. S.J. 484 | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 484 Amendment 77fb | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 433 | |
2011-02-10 | Education Title amended, Passed Amendment 77cta | |
2011-02-10 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 395 | |
2011-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-08 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-08 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 77ce | |
2011-02-08 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-21 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 165 |