TN HB0086 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that property assessors may retain electronic or digital copies of property tax exemption applications to comply with existing retention requirement. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-212.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that property assessors may retain electronic or digital copies of property tax exemption applications to comply with existing retention requirement. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-212.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 155 | |
2017-04-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-03-30 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/3/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-20 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1318 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 155