TN HB0219 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 181
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 181
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that gasification facilities and pyrolysis facilities are not solid waste facilities or incinerators, post-use polymers and recoverable feedstocks are not solid waste, and gasification facilities and pyrolysis facilities are subject to any other applicable environmental, health, and safety requirements for such facilities. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 211.
Title
As enacted, specifies that gasification facilities and pyrolysis facilities are not solid waste facilities or incinerators, post-use polymers and recoverable feedstocks are not solid waste, and gasification facilities and pyrolysis facilities are subject to any other applicable environmental, health, and safety requirements for such facilities. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 211.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 181 | |
2019-04-08 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0923 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 181