TN HB0350 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the bureau of TennCare, June 30, 2019, and requires the bureau to report back to the committee concerning the findings in its 2014 performance audit report. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 10 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, extends the bureau of TennCare, June 30, 2019, and requires the bureau to report back to the committee concerning the findings in its 2014 performance audit report. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 10 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 31 | |
2015-03-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2015 |
2015-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-04 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0226 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 31
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0350&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0350.pdf |