TN HB0395 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 420
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, removes references and duties of the Tennessee Judicial Council, which terminated June 30, 2009. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 6; Title 8; Title 16; Title 17; Title 29; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, removes references and duties of the Tennessee Judicial Council, which terminated June 30, 2009. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 6; Title 8; Title 16; Title 17; Title 29; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Pub. Ch. 420
2019-05-29 Effective date(s) 05/21/2019
2019-05-21 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-14HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-02HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-29SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2019-04-29SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-22SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-18HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-18HousePassed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-16HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-16HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-11HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/16/2019
2019-04-11HouseR/S Ref. to Government Operations Committee
2019-04-10HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
2019-02-06HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary-- Government Operations for Review
2019-02-04HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0454 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 420

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback