TN HB0765 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 498
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 498
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits a permanent legal resident of the United States who is an honorably discharged veteran of the United States armed forces to be employed as a police officer; requires such an officer to apply for or obtain citizenship within six years of the employment start date. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 38, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, permits a permanent legal resident of the United States who is an honorably discharged veteran of the United States armed forces to be employed as a police officer; requires such an officer to apply for or obtain citizenship within six years of the employment start date. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 38, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 498 | |
2015-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/20/15 |
2015-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-09 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to Next Calendar |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/7/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/7/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/11/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/11/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1012 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 498
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0765&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0765.pdf |