TN HB0786 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that offenders' community reentry programs include ability to obtain a 12-month deferral of fines and costs for traffic offenses and a restricted driver license for work only. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 16; Title 18; Title 28; Title 33; Title 40; Title 41 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, requires that offenders' community reentry programs include ability to obtain a 12-month deferral of fines and costs for traffic offenses and a restricted driver license for work only. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 16; Title 18; Title 28; Title 33; Title 40; Title 41 and Title 55.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-24 | House | Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0863 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-24 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0786&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0786.pdf |