TN HB1283 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits the use of a photo identification card issued by this state, the United States, or an accredited postsecondary institution of education in this state for purposes of verifying the identity of an eligible voter. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 7, relative to evidence of identification for voting.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | House | Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0023 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee