TN HB1531 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes municipalities operating an electric plant to provide telecommunication services, including fiber-to-the-premises, in geographical areas both within and outside of the electric plant's service area. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to fiber-to-the-premises.
Sponsors
Rep. Iris Rudder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | P1C. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro. |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1512 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee