TN HB2001 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends, from three business days to five business days, the time in which a provider must send a claimant's medical records to a requesting party after receipt of payment for the records. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 26.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29, Chapter 26, relative to healthcare liability actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 4/9/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-03-06 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2253 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.