TN HB2053 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 554
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 554
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires clerks of circuit court, criminal court, general sessions courts, other special courts created by law, and municipal courts exercising concurrent general sessions jurisdiction, to notify the Tennessee bureau of investigation of the final disposition in criminal proceedings within three business days of the disposition, rather than 72 hours. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 18 and Title 18, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 16, Chapter 18 and Title 18, Chapter 4, relative to notification to the Tennessee bureau of investigation of final disposition of criminal proceedings.
Sponsors
Rep. Kip Capley [R] | Rep. Jody Barrett [R] | Rep. Jake McCalmon [R] | Rep. Curtis Johnson [R] |
Rep. Johnny Garrett [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 554 | |
2024-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-02-15 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/15/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1842 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 03/11/2024