TN HB2064 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that the commission report each year to the members of the general assembly the number of licensed manufacturers providing alcohol samples on premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-202(i)(1).
Title
As introduced, requires that the commission report each year to the members of the general assembly the number of licensed manufacturers providing alcohol samples on premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-202(i)(1).
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2018 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-25 - Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/3/2020