TN HB2486 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a director of schools to delegate one or more of the duties assigned to the director by the local board of education to another administrator or employee of the LEA, if the board has adopted a policy authorizing the respective duty to be delegated to the respective individual. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to directors of schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2932 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Transmitted to Governor for action.