TN HB2613 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the office of energy programs to report annually to the agriculture and natural resources committee of the house of representatives and the energy, agriculture and natural resources committee of the senate concerning the office's efforts to assist Tennessee institutions and citizens for research and experimentation, in the development of clean energy technologies during the immediately preceding calendar year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires the office of energy programs to report annually to the agriculture and natural resources committee of the house of representatives and the energy, agriculture and natural resources committee of the senate concerning the office's efforts to assist Tennessee institutions and citizens for research and experimentation, in the development of clean energy technologies during the immediately preceding calendar year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2475 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee