TN HB2704 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits the second look commission to electronically submit the report detailing the commission's findings and recommendations from a review of an appropriate sampling of cases involving a second or subsequent incident of severe child abuse to the governor, the senate judiciary and health and welfare committees, and the house of representatives civil justice committee. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to children.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Iris Rudder [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-15 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2024-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-08 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2024-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2024-02-28 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Sponsor change. |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2929 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor.